This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 10:11:51 (UTC).

DOPOKOV, VLADIMIR - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 DOPOKOV, VLADIMIR - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1999

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCHALE PAULA

Decedent

DOPOKOV VLADIMIR

Not Classified By Court

ISAEVA ANASTASIA

BJORKLUND ROBERT

POLIAKOVA OLGA

Interested Parties

HORNSTEIN STEVEN HOWARD

LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE A. SHOHET APC

SMITH MEREDITH R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HORNSTEIN STEVEN HOWARD

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

ABBASSI EVAN KHYABANI

SHOHET GEORGE AARON

Interested Party Attorney

QUINTANA DAVID SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/19/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/19/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Amended Status Report of Personal Representative - 7/7/2023

5/8/2023: Notice - Hearing - Amended Status Report of Personal Representative - 7/7/2023

Supplement - to Address and Clear Probate Notes

5/8/2023: Supplement - to Address and Clear Probate Notes

Notice - Hearing - Petition for Order Authorizing of Expenses to Administrator from Estate - 5/19/2023

5/8/2023: Notice - Hearing - Petition for Order Authorizing of Expenses to Administrator from Estate - 5/19/2023

Proof of Service

5/8/2023: Proof of Service

Minute Order

4/27/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2023: Minute Order

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Account

4/25/2023: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Account

Status Report of Personal Representative - Amended Status Report of Personal Representative

4/25/2023: Status Report of Personal Representative - Amended Status Report of Personal Representative

Account - Final or Waiver - Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account and Petition for Final Distribution

4/25/2023: Account - Final or Waiver - Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account and Petition for Final Distribution

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

4/25/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Ex Parte - Order

4/4/2023: Ex Parte - Order

Declaration - Declaration of Evane Abbassi re Ex Parte Notice

4/3/2023: Declaration - Declaration of Evane Abbassi re Ex Parte Notice

Declaration - Declaration of Anastasia Isaeva in Support of Ex Parte Petition

4/3/2023: Declaration - Declaration of Anastasia Isaeva in Support of Ex Parte Petition

Ex Parte - Petition - Ex Parte Petition for Order Confirming Transfer of Real Property to Heir

4/3/2023: Ex Parte - Petition - Ex Parte Petition for Order Confirming Transfer of Real Property to Heir

Proof of Service

3/9/2023: Proof of Service

Status Report of Personal Representative

3/9/2023: Status Report of Personal Representative

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Accounting Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Authority Hearing (Non-Trust)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Report Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Status Report Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Authority Hearing (Non-Trust) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketPetition Denied (Status Report of Personal Representative filed on March 9, 2023 by Evan Khyabani Abbassi. )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Contestant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Contestant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketObjection (Objection of Appointment of Personal Representative ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service of Contest ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less