This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 05:35:19 (UTC).

DONNIE KENT VS GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 DONNIE KENT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4348

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KENT DONNIE

Defendant and Respondent

GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHEMTOUB MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/21/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

5/21/2019: Order - Dismissal

Unknown

5/21/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

5/7/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT)

12/14/2017: NOTICE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT)

COMPLAINT

11/21/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 05/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • NOTICE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by DONNIE KENT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC684348    Hearing Date: December 04, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

DONNIE KENT,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARD & WELLNESS CENTRE, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC684348

[TENATATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 4, 2019

Plaintiff’s attorney seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been a breakdown of the relationship that renders further representation impossible.  Counsel failed to file proof of service of the declaration or proposed order in support of the motion; Counsel only filed proof of service of the motion itself.  CRC 3.1362.  Proof of service of all papers filed with the motion must be filed before the Court can grant the motion. 

Additionally, Counsel declares he confirmed Plaintiff’s address via certified mail, return receipt; the Court wishes to view a copy of the signed return receipt to verify the address is confirmed. 

Finally, Counsel declares he will have trial in the matter continued before the motion is heard.  As of the drafting of this tentative ruling, trial remains scheduled for 12/06/19; withdrawal without a trial continuance would be grossly prejudicial to Plaintiff, and therefore the motion is denied on this ground as well. 

The motion is denied without prejudice.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  

Case Number: BC684348    Hearing Date: November 22, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

DONNIE KENT,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARD & WELLNESS CENTRE, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC684348

[TENATATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 22, 2019

Hearing on this Motion will not take place November 22, 2019.

Plaintiff’s attorney seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been a breakdown of the relationship that renders further representation impossible. Counsel failed to file proof of service of the declaration or proposed order in support of the motion; Counsel only filed proof of service of the motion itself. CRC 3.1362. Proof of service of all papers filed with the motion must be filed before the Court can grant the motion.

Additionally, Counsel declares he confirmed Plaintiff’s address via certified mail, return receipt; the Court wishes to view a copy of the signed return receipt to verify the address is confirmed.

Finally, Counsel declares he will have trial in the matter continued before the motion is heard. As of the drafting of this tentative ruling, trial remains scheduled for 12/06/19; withdrawal without a trial continuance would be grossly prejudicial to Plaintiff, and therefore the motion is denied on this ground as well.

The motion is denied without prejudice.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Hearing on this Motion will not take place November 22, 2019.

Temporary Scheduling Change:

1. Parties who wish to be heard on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org confirming possible changes in the date and time of the hearing;

2. Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org

If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.