This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 03:39:28 (UTC).

DONNETTA AKERS VS THE WYNNBRAIR, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 DONNETTA AKERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE WYNNBRAIR, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1955

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AKERS DONNETTA

Defendants

AT&T A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

AT&T INC.

CITY OF CULVER CITY A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

REAL SUPPORT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

THE WYNNBRAIR A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

THE WYNNBRAIR CONDOMINIUM OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS GERALD LEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2024
  • Hearing11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Donnetta Akers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Donnetta Akers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Donnetta Akers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF CULVER CITY A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE