This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 04:59:22 (UTC).

DONNA WALKER ET AL VS LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 DONNA WALKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3910

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Minors

TRESVANT DEREK

TRESVANT CLAUDIA

WALKER DONNA

TRESVANT TARYN

DONNA WALKER GAL

TRESVANT CHANDA

DONNA WALKER GAL TARYN TRESVANT

Respondents and Defendants

AUTOZONE INC.

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

BECK CHARLIE

LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LUNA EDDIE

EDDIE LUNA LAW OFFICES OF

MCMURRAY RANDY H. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL N. FEUER CITY ATTORNEY

GREENWOOD ELIZABETH LOUISE

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

EDDIE LUNA LAW OFFICES OF

MCMURRAY RANDY H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH GREENWOOD; EXHIBIT

8/30/2017: DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH GREENWOOD; EXHIBIT

DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

8/30/2017: DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/24/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Unknown

3/14/2017: Unknown

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/14/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Unknown

3/14/2017: Unknown

Unknown

3/14/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/14/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

3/14/2017: Unknown

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

1/17/2018: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Minute Order

1/17/2018: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER STATE LAW, ETC

1/5/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER STATE LAW, ETC

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

1/5/2018: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

12/4/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY RE: REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

2/5/2018: NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY RE: REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT REGARDING THE VICARIOUS LIABILITY OF DEFENDANT AVIS BASED ON THE GRAVES AMENDMENT;

2/5/2018: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT REGARDING THE VICARIOUS LIABILITY OF DEFENDANT AVIS BASED ON THE GRAVES AMENDMENT;

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order ReReassignment Of Case; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR DEREK TRESVANT GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Donna Walker (Plaintiff); Chanda Tresvant (Plaintiff); Derek Tresvant (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Donna Walker (Plaintiff); Chanda Tresvant (Plaintiff); Derek Tresvant (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOZONE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMURRAY RANDY HUE