Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 04:53:39 (UTC).

DONNA MORGAN VS DAKOTA HARRIS EZELL

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 DONNA MORGAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAKOTA HARRIS EZELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7258

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MORGAN DONNA

Defendants and Respondents

EZELL DAKOTA HARRIS

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SILVERMAN AND GOLDSZER

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/13/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order

12/14/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

6/30/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/30/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Donna Morgan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Donna Morgan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC667258    Hearing Date: July 29, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

donna morgan,

Plaintiff,

v.

DAKOTA ARRIS EZELL,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC667258

Hearing Date: July 29, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion for leave to intervene by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proposed Intervenor State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Intervenor”) seeks leave to intervene in this action per Code of Civil Procedure section 387. Section 387 permits intervention in a pending action when the proposed intervenor has an interest in the matter that is the subject of the litigation, or in the success of any party. Code of Civil Procedure section 387, subd. (b) provides, “if the person seeking intervention claims an interest relating to the property or transaction which is the subject of the action and that person is so situated that the disposition of the action may as a practical matter impair or impede that person’s ability to protect that interest, unless that person's interest is adequately represented by existing parties, the court shall, upon timely application, permit that person to intervene.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 387, subd. (b).) A liability insurer normally is not a party to an action by a third party against its insured, but may have the right to intervene in certain circumstances.

Intervenor has demonstrated that it issued an insurance policy to Defendant Dakota P. Ezell (“Defendant”). That policy might obligate Intervenor to pay any judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff Donna Morgan. Intervenor has been unable to locate or communicate with Defendant. Defendant therefore cannot defend this action. Based upon the foregoing, the Court thus concludes that Intervenor has a sufficient interest in this matter to support its intervention in this case, which Defendant cannot protect.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Intervenor’s motion for leave to intervene is granted. Intervenor shall file its proposed complaint in intervention within ten (10) days. Intervenor shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: July 29, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court