This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 01:42:41 (UTC).

DONNA K HOWARD VS ALEXANDER CALE LINDER ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 DONNA K HOWARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEXANDER CALE LINDER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0248

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HOWARD DONNA K.

Defendants and Respondents

LINDER ALEXANDER CALE

LINDER CHARLES

DOES 1 TO 100

LINDNER CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SAVAGLIO BARBARA B. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GILBERT DON WAYNE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/2/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

4/2/2018: SUMMONS

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/2/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Answer

11/14/2018: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2018: Proof of Personal Service

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/31/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Alexander Cale Linder (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alexander Cale Linder (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Of Summons); Filed by Donna K. Howard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Of Summons); Filed by Donna K. Howard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Donna K. Howard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILBERT DON W. ESQ.