This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 15:12:36 (UTC).

DONNA FRIZZELL, ET AL. VS ABB, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 DONNA FRIZZELL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8985

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRIZZELL CARROLL

FRIZZELL DONNA

Defendants

A.H. VOSS COMPANY

ABB INC.

AMCORD INC. FKA FORMERLY KNOWN AS RIVERSIDE CEMENT COMPANY

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

BWDAC INC.

CALPORTLAND COMPANY FKA FORMERLY KNOWN AS CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

COPELAND LUMBER YARDS INC.

EASTON CORPORATION

ERNEST PIERSON CO. DBA PIERSON BUILDING CENTER

FORMOSA PLASTICS CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GEORGE C. JACOBS COMPANY OF EUREKA

GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC.

HILFIKER PIPE CO

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIED SIGNAL INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

HUMBOLDT SUPPLY COMPANY DBA ARCATA AUTO SUPPLY

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES H.W. TREY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (JONES & BENDON LLP))

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (JONES & BENDON LLP))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 1:46 PM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Initial Status Conference (TO BE HEARD WITH GROUP S/CONF. FOR JONES & BENDON, LLP (Frizzell 21STCV38985))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Jones & Bendon LLP))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Donna Frizzell (Plaintiff); Carroll Frizzell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Donna Frizzell (Plaintiff); Carroll Frizzell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Donna Frizzell (Plaintiff); Carroll Frizzell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Easton Ice Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where A.H. VOSS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALPORTLAND COMPANY is a litigant