Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 21:00:50 (UTC).

DONIS ESTRADA VS CALI-FAME OF LOS ANGELES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 DONIS ESTRADA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CALI-FAME OF LOS ANGELES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5821

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA DONIS

Defendants

KENNEDY BRIAN

CALI-FAME OF LOS ANGELES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ESTRADA DIANA M.

Other Attorneys

CHAMI POUYA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/30/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/29/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Answer

1/22/2021: Answer

Answer

1/22/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/30/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Pouya Chami (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Donis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Donis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Cali-Fame of Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Brian Kennedy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Case Reassignment); Filed by Donis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (Amended Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Donis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brian Kennedy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cali-Fame of Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Donis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Donis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Donis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMI POUYA