Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 00:42:54 (UTC).

DONG LI VS MEITAO EXPRESS MAIL ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 DONG LI filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against MEITAO EXPRESS MAIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5216

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LI DONG

Appellants

MEITAO EXPRESS MAIL

YUAN JUANBIN

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HSU CHIALEI

Appellant Attorney

XU HANZHANG

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for

1/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Order

2/4/2019: Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/5/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Substitution of Attorney

3/25/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

4/8/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/21/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/11/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/12/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application

6/13/2019: Ex Parte Application

Order

6/13/2019: Order

Minute Order

6/13/2019: Minute Order

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

6/24/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Motion for Attorney Fees

7/1/2019: Motion for Attorney Fees

NOTICE OF APPEAL

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF APPEAL

Case Management Statement

1/10/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

9/28/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

9/28/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY--LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

10/3/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY--LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Ex Parte Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by Dong Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Dong Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order to enter request for dismissal dismissing entire case with prejudice and for order to release bond to plaintiff; declaration of may t. to) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Order (Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an order to enter request for dismissal and for release of bond); Filed by Dong Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Dong Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to enter request...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an order to enter request for dismissal dismissing entire case with prejudice and for order to release bond to plaintiff; declaration of may t. to); Filed by Dong Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Juanbin Yuan (Appellant); Meitao Express Mail (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Dong Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/23/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Juanbin Yuan (Appellant); Meitao Express Mail (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Dong Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY--LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU CHIALEI