This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:22:44 (UTC).

DONG KYU JOO ET AL VS SUMMA INTERSTATES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 DONG KYU JOO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUMMA INTERSTATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7516

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOO DONG KYU

LEE HOWARD 17U01396

SHIN CHUNG KYONG

Defendants

LEE HOWARD

LEE JUNG S

LEE PAULINE M

LEE JAE HWAN

LEE HOWARD H

LEE JASON J.

LEE HOWARD DBA INTERSTATE REALTY AND INVESTMENT COMPANY

INTERSTATES SUMMA

LEE JASON J. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAAN KENNETH TAEHO

SUTTON RAYMOND M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MILLIGAN KAREN TANG

 

Court Documents

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/7/2017: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY HOWARD LEE TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION; ETC

12/18/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY HOWARD LEE TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION; ETC

OPPOSITION TO HOWARD LEE'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION

1/5/2018: OPPOSITION TO HOWARD LEE'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY HOWARD LEE TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION

1/12/2018: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY HOWARD LEE TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION

DEFENDANTS SUMMA INTERSTATES; HOWARD LEE; JAE HWAN LEE; JUNG S. LEE; HOWARD H. LEE AND PAULINE M. LEE, TRUSTEES OF THE HOWARD AND PAULINE LEE LIVING TRUST'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAIN

1/16/2018: DEFENDANTS SUMMA INTERSTATES; HOWARD LEE; JAE HWAN LEE; JUNG S. LEE; HOWARD H. LEE AND PAULINE M. LEE, TRUSTEES OF THE HOWARD AND PAULINE LEE LIVING TRUST'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAIN

DEFENDANTS SUMMA INTERSTATES; HOWARD LEE, JASON LEE, JAE HWAN LEE, JUNG S. LEE, HOWARD H. LEE AND PAULINE M. LEE, TRUSTEES OF THE HOWARD AND PAULINE LEE LIVING TRUST'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

1/16/2018: DEFENDANTS SUMMA INTERSTATES; HOWARD LEE, JASON LEE, JAE HWAN LEE, JUNG S. LEE, HOWARD H. LEE AND PAULINE M. LEE, TRUSTEES OF THE HOWARD AND PAULINE LEE LIVING TRUST'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

Minute Order

1/19/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

1/19/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE, ETC

1/19/2018: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE, ETC

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL

1/19/2018: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION BY HOWARD LEE TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION

1/23/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION BY HOWARD LEE TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/2/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/2/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/5/2018: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

4/5/2018: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

DEPARTMENT 53 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS

4/12/2018: DEPARTMENT 53 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS

Minute Order

4/12/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/13/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (and Alternatively for Summary Adjudication) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dong Kyu Joo (Plaintiff); Chung Kyong Shin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lee, Howard (17U01396) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lee, Howard (17U01396) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Lee, Howard (17U01396) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketExhibit List (and Exhibit Binder); Filed by Lee, Howard (17U01396) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Lee, Howard (17U01396) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 53; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dong Kyu Joo (Plaintiff); Aj Coin Laundry (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dong Kyu Joo (Plaintiff); Aj Coin Laundry (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dong Kyu Joo (Plaintiff); Lee, Howard (17U01396) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND FOR: I) BREACH OF QUIET ENJOYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

| ' FILED

Kenneth T. Haan, SBN 197965 | Suparior Coun of Cafifomia Kenneth A. Levine, SBN 134724 Angeles KENNETH T. HAAN & ASSOCIATES DEC 1

A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION 3 2017

3699 WILSHIRE BLVD., SUITE 860 - LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90010 Sherrt R. Carter, 6 OfficorOlork Telephone: (213) 639-2900 Tory Oepety Facsimile: (213) 639-2909 |

kthaan@haanlaw.com

kenlevine(@haanlaw.com Attorneys for Plaintiftfs, DONG KYU JOO dba AJ Coin Laundry and CHUN KYONG SHIN

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

DONG KYU JOO, an individual dba AJ ) CASE NO.: BC647516 [Lead Case] COIN LAUNDRY; CHUN KYONG ) (Related/Consolidated Case: 17U01396) SHIN, an individual, ) ) [Assigned to Hon. Howard L. Halm, Dept 53] ) . Plaintiff, - )

) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

) FOR DAMAGES AND FOR: VS. ) | ) 1) Breach of Contract ) 2) Bad Faith Breach of Implied Covenant SUMMA INTERSTATES, an unknown ) | of Good Faith and Fair Dealing business entity; HOWARD LEE, an ) 3) . Fraud and Deceit (Intentional individual and as dba INTERSTATE ) Misrepresentation) REALTY AND INVESTMENT ) 4) Assault COMPANY, an unknown business entity;) 5) Intentional Infliction of Emotional JAE HWAN LEE, an individual; JUNG ) Distress S. LEE, an individual; HOWARD H. ) 6) Negligent Infliction of Emotional LEE and PAULINE M. LEE, trustees of ) Distress THE HOWARD AND PAULINELEE ) 7) Declaratory Relief LIVING TRUST; JASON J. LEE, an ) - individual; and DOES 2 through 20, ) inclusive, ) ) (Complaint Filed on 01/19/2017)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUTTON RAYMOND M. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAAN KENNETH T.