This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 07:16:09 (UTC).

DONALD KESTELEYN ET AL VS MSG SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT LLC ET

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 DONALD KESTELEYN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MSG SPORTS ENTERTAINMENT LLC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9623

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

KESTELYN SUSAN

KESTELEYN DONALD

Respondents and Defendants

LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE INC.

MSG SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT LLC

DOES 1 TO 100

MSG FORUM LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HIEPLER & HIEPLER

HIEPLER MICHELLE R

Defendant Attorneys

VAHIDI STEVEN S.

TRUSZKOWSKI HENRY CHARLES

TRUSZKOWSKI HENRY C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • Hearing03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 3:50 PM in Department 31; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduling Hearings Pursuant to Emergency C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Rescheduling Hearings Pursuant to Emergency C...) of 08/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Donald Kesteleyn (Plaintiff); Susan Kestelyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Donald Kesteleyn (Plaintiff); Susan Kestelyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Donald Kesteleyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Donald Kesteleyn (Plaintiff); Susan Kestelyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Donald Kesteleyn (Plaintiff); Susan Kestelyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant