This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2020 at 18:05:19 (UTC).

DONALD DAVIDSON VS TODD KAPLAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 DONALD DAVIDSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TODD KAPLAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5164

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

DAVIDSON DONALD DR.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DORNE COURTNEY

MEDICAL INVESTOR HOLDINGS LLC DBA VERTICAL COMPANIES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VERTICAL WELLNESS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

KAPLAN TODD

NCAP2 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GALPERIN YURY

KAUFMAN ARYEH

Defendant Attorney

KAPLAN ELYSE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

6/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

7/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF DR. DONALD DAVIDSON'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF DR. DONALD DAVIDSON'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/19/2020

5/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/19/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

5/19/2020: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/12/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

Cross-Complaint

3/13/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/13/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Ruling

4/3/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff Dr. Donald Davidson's Notice of Withdrawal of Special Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Cross-Complaint); Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/19/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSpecial Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion); Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Todd Kaplan (Defendant); Courtney Dorne (Defendant); MEDICAL INVESTOR HOLDINGS LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Todd Kaplan (Defendant); Courtney Dorne (Defendant); MEDICAL INVESTOR HOLDINGS LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Donald Davidson, Dr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less