This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 00:01:25 (UTC).

DONALD A BUSH VS GABRIEL MACIAS

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by DONALD A BUSH against GABRIEL MACIAS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6750

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSH DONALD A.

Respondents and Defendants

MACIAS GABRIEL

DOES 1 TO 50

 

Court Documents

NOTICE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES

6/5/2018: NOTICE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES

Answer

11/2/2018: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/15/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

4/17/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

4/17/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

4/17/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice

5/8/2019: Notice

Notice

5/8/2019: Notice

Notice

5/8/2019: Notice

Request

5/9/2019: Request

Minute Order

5/15/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/20/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Opposition

6/12/2019: Opposition

Request for Judicial Notice

6/21/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order

6/25/2019: Minute Order

Notice

7/1/2019: Notice

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

5/21/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Notice (Defendant Gabriel Macias Notice of Withdrawal of Her Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings); Filed by Gabriel Macias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (and Request for Sanctions) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration From the Co...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Gabriel Macias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by Gabriel Macias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Relief; Filed by Gabriel Macias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Donald A. Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from the Court's Ruling of May 15, 2019 Granting Defendant's Motion to Deem Matters in Request for Admission, Set One as Admitted, Filed February 5,2019; and Request for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Gabriel; Filed by Donald A. Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Gabriel Macias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Request for Sanctions) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Gabriel Macias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Answer (To Complaint ; Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by Gabriel Macias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • NOTICE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Donald A. Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706750    Hearing Date: February 24, 2020    Dept: 29

Bush v. Macias

The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Gabriel Macias to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories Set One and Requests for Production of Documents is CONTINUED to March 17, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Although it is styled as a motion to compel initial responses, the motion is actually a motion to compel further responses to the sets of discovery. In accordance with the standing order, an informal discovery conference has been set for 2/24/2020.  The Court continues the hearing to a date that is 16 court days after the informal discovery conference so that the parties will have an opportunity to provide supplemental briefing regarding any issues that may remain after the IDC.

The judicial assistant is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC706750    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 2

Bush v. Macias, BC706750

The hearing on the Motion to Compel Discovery is CONTINUED to December 13, 2019.

With respect to the form interrogatories and special interrogatories, Defendant has served responses that Plaintiff contends are deficient. Thus, the motion is a motion to compel further responses, not a motion to compel initial responses. Plaintiff is required to comply with the procedural requirements that apply to motions to compel further responses. Among other things, Plaintiff is required to schedule and participate in an Informal Discovery Conference with the Court before the motion may be heard. See Court’s Standing Order Re Personal Injury Procedures, Central District ¶¶ 12-13, effective 9/26/2018. The only exception to this requirement arises when the opposing party fails or refuses to participate in the conference. There has been no showing that Plaintiff has attempted to schedule such a conference or that Defendant has refused to participate. The Court thus continues the hearing to provide Plaintiff with the opportunity to schedule the Informal Discovery Conference. Plaintiff is ordered to schedule the first available date. If no dates are available prior to December 13, 2019, Plaintiff is ordered to schedule the first available date and inform the Court so that the hearing can be further continued to a date after the conference.

With respect to the Requests for Production of Documents, Plaintiff has presented no evidence the requests were served. There is no proof of service attached to the set of Requests for Production attached to the motion at Exhibit C. A proof of service is required. Further, Defendant’s counsel provided a declaration stating that no request for production had been received. The Court thus intends to deny the motion with respect to the Requests for Production based on the present record. This denial will be without prejudice to any further motion that may be required if the Requests are served and responses are not provided.

The clerk is ordered to give notice.