This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 03:24:07 (UTC).

DONAHVON STERKES, ET AL. VS OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 DONAHVON STERKES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5194

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CROSBY BENJAMIN

ELAM ZAC

STERKES DONAHVON

Defendants

BLOOMIN BRANDS INC.

OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELAHY ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

NAGEOTTE KYLE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

5/9/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

5/11/2022: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service

4/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

3/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Answer

3/30/2022: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

3/30/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/30/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/30/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

3/30/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40, David Sotelo, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Filing of Notice of Removal); Filed by OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC (Defendant); BLOOMIN BRANDS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC (Defendant); BLOOMIN BRANDS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DONAHVON STERKES (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN CROSBY (Plaintiff); ZAC ELAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC DOING BUSINESS AS CARRABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL is a litigant

Latest cases where Bloomin' Brands, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELAHY ALLEN B. ESQ.