This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 00:28:07 (UTC).

DOMINIQUE JOHNSON VS AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 DOMINIQUE JOHNSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS and ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6972

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON DOMINIQUE

Defendants

TABRON MICHAEL

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

VETS SECURING AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN JAY

Defendant Attorneys

WEBER JULIE M

KINNEY CYNTHIA DURHAM

BRODSKY BARRY ZITRON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/9/2022: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/16/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

3/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Request for Dismissal

6/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2020: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

12/10/2020: Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION VETS SECURING AMERICA...)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION VETS SECURING AMERICA...)

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS

12/3/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS

Case Management Statement

11/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/25/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/25/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

11/18/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/13/2020: Case Management Statement

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Service); Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by American Guard Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Michael Tabron (Defendant); Vets Securing America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (VETS SECURING AMERICA, INC.'S NOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE 18 CONCLUSION OF ARBITRATION) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (DEFENDANT'S PETITION TO COMPELARBITRATION AND STAY ALLPROCEEDINGS PENDING THECONCLUSION OF ARBITRATION) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (DEFENDANT MICHAEL TABRON'S NOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE CONCLUSION OF ARBITRATION) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Mohamed A. Youssef And Cynthia D. Kinney In Support Of Petition To Compel Arbitration And Stay All Proceedings Pending The Conclusion Of Arbitration); Filed by American Guard Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (Of Petition And Petition To Compel Arbitration And Stay All Proceedings Pending The Conclusion Of Arbitration; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities); Filed by American Guard Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VETS SECURING AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEBER JULIE M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINNEY CYNTHIA DURHAM