This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 22:55:33 (UTC).

DOMINIQUE HIGASHI VS PATIENT ACCOUNTING SERVICE CENTER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 DOMINIQUE HIGASHI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PATIENT ACCOUNTING SERVICE CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5285

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIGASHI DOMINIQUE

Defendants

PATIENT ACCOUNTING SERVICE CENTER LLC DBA GETIXHEALTH

TRUJILLO GABRIELA

CERDA ARMANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHADDOW TALI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

12/4/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Hearing03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Dominique Higashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dominique Higashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dominique Higashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dominique Higashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dominique Higashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less