This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 19:26:49 (UTC).

DOMINICK ROBERT ORTIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS JILL DAISY MAX, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 DOMINICK ROBERT ORTIZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JILL DAISY MAX, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9066

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ AN INDIVIDUAL DOMINICK ROBERT

Defendant

MAX AN INDIVIDUAL JILL DAISY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE VORE MICHAEL J.

Defendant Attorney

OGUNNUBI MELISSA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/4/2021: Answer

PI General Order

6/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DOMINICK ROBERT ORTIZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DOMINICK ROBERT ORTIZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JILL DAISY MAX, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JILL DAISY MAX, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DOMINICK ROBERT ORTIZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DOMINICK ROBERT ORTIZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DOMINICK ROBERT ORTIZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE VORE MICHAEL J.