This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2022 at 10:45:05 (UTC).

DOMINIC WRIGHT VS JB WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 DOMINIC WRIGHT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JB WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5591

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT DOMINIC

Defendants

BUILDERS SUPPLY LOGISTICS INC.

BUILDING SUPPLIES LOGISTICS

JB WHOLESALE ROOFING & BUILDING SUPPLIES INC

JB WHOLESALE ROOFING & BUILDING SUPPLY

JB WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES

JB WHOLESALE-SAN BERNARDINO

JB WHOLESALE-SANTA FE SPRINGS

POULIOT MATTHEW

SRS DISTRIBUTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHU TIELLE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GRODAN ALEXANDER L

GROSSMAN MARC ELLIOT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/26/2022

9/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/26/2022

Case Management Statement

9/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/6/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

9/6/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/30/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

8/11/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

8/11/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

8/12/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Dominic Wright on 05/10/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Dominic Wright as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Dominic Wright (Plaintiff); SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 09/26/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55 updated: Result Date to 09/26/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Defendant); JB WHOLESALE ROOFING & BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC (Defendant); BUILDERS SUPPLY LOGISTICS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dominic Wright (Plaintiff); As to: JB WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES (Defendant); SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Defendant); JB WHOLESALE ROOFING & BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dominic Wright (Plaintiff); As to: JB WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES (Defendant); SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Defendant); JB WHOLESALE ROOFING & BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dominic Wright (Plaintiff); As to: JB WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES (Defendant); SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Defendant); JB WHOLESALE ROOFING & BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.B. WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SRS DISTRIBUTION INC DOING BUSINESS AS SUNCOAST ROOFERS SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHU TIELLE