This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 15:15:43 (UTC).

DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC VS G&E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against G E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0602

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC

Defendants

G&E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. AKA NEWMARK GRUBB KNIGHT FRANK

DOES 1 TO 300

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORLAND JAMES J

Defendant Attorney

KEARNEY THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING

12/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

1/19/2021: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

11/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX-PARTE APPLICATION OF LEAVE TO AMEND ITS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/4/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX-PARTE APPLICATION OF LEAVE TO AMEND ITS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION F...)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION F...)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/4/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE) OF 09/08/2020

9/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE) OF 09/08/2020

Amended Complaint

9/9/2020: Amended Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

8/28/2020: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Notice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by G & E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Strike Punitive Damage Claim from Second Amended Complaint); Filed by G & E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Second Amended Complaint); Filed by G & E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by G & E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docketat 2:35 PM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: CCP 170.6 challenge) of 09/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: CCP 170.6 challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G&E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant