This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 01:05:10 (UTC).

DOLORES WEEKS, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 DOLORES WEEKS filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4617

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEEKS DAVID E.

WEEKS DOLORES

WEEKS LAUREN J.

WEEKS LOUANNE

WEEKS ROBERT E.

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

"BERNIE" BERNHEIM STEVEN J.

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG A.

RECK BELYNDA B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/2/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

5/31/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/23/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service by Mail

5/23/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/23/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/18/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/18/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/18/2022

5/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/18/2022

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/22/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO

6/13/2022: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison International?s Answer To Plaintiffs? Complaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Submission Re: Southern California Edison Company And Edison International?s Petition To Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order re: Complex Determination); Filed by Dolores Weeks (Plaintiff); David E. Weeks (Plaintiff); Louanne Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Dolores Weeks (Plaintiff); David E. Weeks (Plaintiff); Louanne Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Dolores Weeks (Plaintiff); David E. Weeks (Plaintiff); Louanne Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Steven J. "Bernie" Bernheim (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 2:34 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Determination) of 05/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dolores Weeks (Plaintiff); David E. Weeks (Plaintiff); Louanne Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dolores Weeks (Plaintiff); David E. Weeks (Plaintiff); Louanne Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dolores Weeks (Plaintiff); David E. Weeks (Plaintiff); Louanne Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant