This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 17:32:21 (UTC).

DOLORES VIZCARRA VS GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 DOLORES VIZCARRA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4973

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIZCARRA DOLORES

Defendant

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCREYNOLDS C. R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2024
  • Hearing07/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dolores Vizcarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dolores Vizcarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dolores Vizcarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AKA GLENDALE GALLERIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCREYNOLDS CHRISTOPHER ROBERT