Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 19:07:35 (UTC).

DOLORES LEDESMA VS WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 DOLORES LEDESMA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS ALMONDS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5316

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEDESMA DOLORES

Defendant

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVRETOVICH JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

JAVAHERI MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

2/6/2020: Order - Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL JAVAHERI

1/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL JAVAHERI

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

1/9/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/19/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/23/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Ruling

10/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RES ID: 7931))

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RES ID: 7931))

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/3/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Case Management Order

6/13/2019: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

5/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/29/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/12/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/8/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Answers to Form Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and for Order Establishing Admissions and for Monetary Sanctions (Res ID7123)) - Held - Retrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MICHAEL JAVAHERI); Filed by WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (Answers to Form Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and for Order Establishing Admissions and for Monetary Sanctions (Res ID: 7123)); Filed by WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel ((Res ID7931)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of CMC); Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT); Filed by WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dolores Ledesma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV05316    Hearing Date: February 06, 2020    Dept: 73

2/6/20

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

DOLORES LEDESMA v. WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC, et al.

(19STCV05316)

Defendant’s motion to compel plaintiff’s answers to form interrogatories (general and employment law), requests for production of documents, and for order establishing admissions and for monetary sanctions (filed 1/9/20)

TENTATIVE RULING

(1) Defendant’s unopposed motion to compel answers to form interrogatories and response to requests for production of documents, set one is GRANTED. The court orders Plaintiff to provide verified responses, without objections, and production of documents within 30 days.

(2) Defendant’s unopposed motion to have truth of any matters specified in Defendant’s request for admissions, set one be deemed admitted is GRANTED.

Defendant’s request for sanctions are granted in the amount of $2,055, but stayed until further order of the court.

Notice of ruling by moving party.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant