Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 10:08:29 (UTC).

DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. VS ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5315

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY INC.

Defendant

ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NATOLI NOELLE MARIE

NATOLI-DUFFY NOELLE MARIE

Defendant Attorneys

MEYEN VICTOR B

MEYEN VICTOR BORIS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/7/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

6/26/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NOELLE NATOLI IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

3/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NOELLE NATOLI IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF INNA HAROUTUNIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

3/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF INNA HAROUTUNIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC.

1/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC.

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/26/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

10/10/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/2/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/2/2019: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • Hearing06/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Hearing06/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Hearing06/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (RePossible Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Possible Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to First Amended Complaint); Filed by ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st) (2nd)); Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (ReDefault Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (ReDefault Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Default of Defendant ERG Home Health Provider, Inc.); Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DOLAINNA PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATOLI NOELLE MARIE