This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 11:34:02 (UTC).

DOE JANE VS GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 DOE JANE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0915

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANE DOE

Defendants

GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC

KAISER PERMANENTE DBA TARZANA HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER FKA SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP

KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL

SAVA SENIOR CARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

SAVA SENIOR CARE LLC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC. FKA SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP DBA TARZANA HEALTH AND REHABITATION CENTER

SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP

CALHOUN INDIVIDUALLY MONICA

DAVINI INDIVIDUALLY SUZANNE

SCANTLBURY INDIVIDUALLY INGRID

SCPMG PARTNERSHIP

TUAZON INDIVIDUALLY JANETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

UZAN OLIVIA

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/12/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/12/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/3/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/3/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/3/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/3/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service - No Service

12/23/2022: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Complaint

10/26/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Alhambra Courthouse in Department 3 - Hon. William A. Crowfooteffective 01/17/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on First Amended Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Doe Jane (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Jane (Plaintiff); GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC (Defendant); KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Doe Jane (Plaintiff); As to: GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC (Defendant); KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL (Defendant); SAVA SENIOR CARE LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Rejected; Submitted by: Doe Jane (Plaintiff); Type: Fictitious Name

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Suzanne Davini, individually (Defendant): First Name changed from Davini to Suzanne; Last Name changed from Suzanne to Davini, individually

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Janette Tuazon, individually (Defendant): Last Name changed from Tuazon to Tuazon, individually

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Monica Calhoun, individually (Defendant): First Name changed from Calhoun to Monica; Last Name changed from Monica to Calhoun, individually

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ingrid Scantlbury, individually (Defendant): Last Name changed from Scantlbury to Scantlbury, individually

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Doe Jane (Plaintiff); As to: GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC (Defendant); KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL (Defendant); SAVA SENIOR CARE LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Doe Jane (Plaintiff); As to: GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC (Defendant); KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL (Defendant); SAVA SENIOR CARE LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Doe Jane (Plaintiff); As to: GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC (Defendant); KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL (Defendant); SAVA SENIOR CARE LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAVA SENIOR CARE ADMINISRATIVEE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where SAVA SENIOR CARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SSC TARZANA OPERATION G COMPANY LPA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL is a litigant