This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 14:20:14 (UTC).

DOBRIN, JEANNE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 DOBRIN, JEANNE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1462

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALTSCHUL JOHN A.

Decedent

DOBRIN JEANNE

Other

BENSON TRACEY

Interested Parties

OFFICE OF CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY GENERAL

OFFICE OF CONSULATE GENERAL OF AUSTRALIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEVITON STUART LAWRENCE

Other Attorney

MABASA KIARA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/3/2021: Minute Order

Will Deposited - 6 Pgs - Dated 08/15/2016

6/4/2021: Will Deposited - 6 Pgs - Dated 08/15/2016

Proof of Service - Gary Bond

8/3/2021: Proof of Service - Gary Bond

Proof of Service - John D'Amico

8/3/2021: Proof of Service - John D'Amico

Proof of Service - Allegra Allison

8/3/2021: Proof of Service - Allegra Allison

Proof of Service - Lauren Meister

8/3/2021: Proof of Service - Lauren Meister

Proof of Service - John A. Altschul

8/3/2021: Proof of Service - John A. Altschul

Proof of Service - Larry Block

8/3/2021: Proof of Service - Larry Block

Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

8/4/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

8/4/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

Proof of Service

8/5/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

8/5/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

8/11/2021: Minute Order

Summons - ISSUED

8/18/2021: Summons - ISSUED

Response - to Probate Notes for 6/3/21 Hearing

6/1/2021: Response - to Probate Notes for 6/3/21 Hearing

Minute Order

4/1/2021: Minute Order

Opposition - Opposition

4/1/2021: Opposition - Opposition

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

3/1/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • Hearing10/20/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (ISSUED ); Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer .MABASA, KIARA M