This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2021 at 22:39:39 (UTC).

DO JA CHOI VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 DO JA CHOI filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2694

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOI DO JA

Defendants

FIRST TRANSIT INC.

AMAYA SILVIA

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN RICHARD D.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

9/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/14/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/26/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • Hearing08/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Do Ja Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Do Ja Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Do Ja Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST TRANSIT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFMAN RICHARD D.