This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2022 at 21:15:33 (UTC).

DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS VS CHAI FIVE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHAI FIVE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0889

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOS SANTOS DNEVALDO

Defendants

CHAI FIVE LAUNDRY SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHAI FIVE LLC DBA FOASBERG LAUNDRY & CLEANERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM BRIANA M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/08/2021

10/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/08/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Settlement

10/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIANA M. KIM RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

2/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIANA M. KIM RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • Hearing05/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Briana M. Kim re: OSC re: Dismissal); Filed by DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docketat 3:11 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DNEVALDO DOS SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAI FIVE LAUNDRY SERVICES INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM BRIANA MINSUN