This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 18:12:18 (UTC).

D&M INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS, INC. VS PUNCHY LIMITED, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 D M INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PUNCHY LIMITED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0878

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D&M INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS INC.

Defendants

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

PUNCHY LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCFARLIN TIMOTHY GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

6/29/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Complaint

6/29/2021: Complaint

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

6/29/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

6/29/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS; EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS; EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

6/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Request for Dismissal

7/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by D&M Investments and Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings; Ex-Parte Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by D&M Investments and Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application); Filed by D&M Investments and Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by D&M Investments and Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by D&M Investments and Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by D&M Investments and Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by D&M Investments and Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by D&M Investments and Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCFARLIN TIMOTHY G.