This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 15:57:06 (UTC).

DKS STEEL DOOR & FRAME SYSTEMS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ABE HAGIGAT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 DKS STEEL DOOR FRAME SYSTEMS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ABE HAGIGAT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0989

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DKS STEEL DOOR & FRAME SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

MODABERPOUR MICHAEL

MODAB INSURANCE SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HAGIGAT ABE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KANDEL ALEXANDER

WOODLAND LAUREN

Defendant Attorneys

DOUGLASS MICHAEL C.

CHU PETER KO

HARDING JACQUELINE JOYCE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Appearance

5/5/2021: Notice of Appearance

Case Management Statement

4/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AT WILSON ELSER AND FOR FUTURE NOTICES TO COUNSEL

2/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AT WILSON ELSER AND FOR FUTURE NOTICES TO COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AT WILSON ELSER AND FOR FUTURE NOTICES TO COUNSEL

3/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AT WILSON ELSER AND FOR FUTURE NOTICES TO COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING

1/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING

Case Management Statement

12/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

11/4/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/3/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Abe Hagigat (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Abe Hagigat (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Counsel at Wilson Elser and for Future Notices to Counsel); Filed by Abe Hagigat (Defendant); Modab Insurance Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Michael Modaberpour (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Counsel at Wilson Elser and for Future Notices to Counsel); Filed by Abe Hagigat (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Ruling); Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Abe Hagigat (Defendant); Modab Insurance Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Michael Modaberpour (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DKS Steel Door & Frame Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DKS STEEL DOOR & FRAME SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODLAND LAUREN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANDEL ALEXANDER