This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 10:45:53 (UTC).

DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT VS DLSE ORNELAS ENT

Case Summary

On 01/24/2017 DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DLSE ORNELAS ENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7432

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT

Defendants and Respondents

ORNELAS ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION

DLSE ORNELAS ENTERPRISES

ORNELAS ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NORRIS MAX D.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/7/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

AMENDED-REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL CIVIL WAGE AND PENALTY ASSESSMENT

2/3/2017: AMENDED-REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL CIVIL WAGE AND PENALTY ASSESSMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Request; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • AMENDED-REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL CIVIL WAGE AND PENALTY ASSESSMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Request; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORNELAS ENTERPRISES INC. DBA ORNELAS ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Max David Norris