This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 05:40:03 (UTC).

DIVERSIFIED AUTOMATION SERVICES INC VS REEVES MECHANICAL SR

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 DIVERSIFIED AUTOMATION SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against REEVES MECHANICAL SR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1871

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DIVERSIFIED AUTOMATION SERVICES INC

DIVERSIFIED AUTOMATION SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

SHEN ZHEN NEW WORLD I LLC

REEVES MECHANICAL SERVICES INC

NEW WORLD NEW AGE I LLC

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY PREPARATORY EDUCATION

DOES 1 TO 100

REEVES SIMON

NEW WORLD NEW AGE HOLDING LLC

STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC

REEVES AN INDIVIDUAL SIMON AKA SIMON JOHN REEVES DBA REEVES MECHANICAL

REEVES MECHANICAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY PREPARATORY EDUCATION FOUNDATION LLC

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC. A TEXAS CORPORATION

SHEN ZHEN NEW WORLD I LLC FKA NEW WORLD/NEW AGE HOLDING LLC FKA NEW WORLD/NEW AGE I LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Defendant

REEVES AN INDIVIDUAL SIMON AKA SIMON JOHN REEVES DBA REEVES MECHANICAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HALL HUGUENIN LLP

EDE JERED T.

Defendant Attorneys

EWING VINCENT C.

PAGAN JOHN M.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SOSA CARLOS E.

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/7/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/16/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/15/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CONTNUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF CONTNUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/3/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

5/21/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/10/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/6/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/28/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/18/2018: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Minute Order

11/26/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/17/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Judgment

2/5/2019: Judgment

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/5/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS ON

1/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS ON

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by WESCO Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Diversified Automation Services, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment on Cross-Complaint) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment on Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Supplemental Declaration (of John M. Pagan in Support of Cross-Complainant, Wesco Insurance Company's Default Judgment by Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by WESCO Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Judgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 02/05/2019 entered for Cross-Complainant WESCO Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation against Cross-Defendant Simon Reeves, an Individual AKA Simon John Reeves, DBA Reeves Mechanical.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by WESCO Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Summons; Filed by WESCO Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by WESCO Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Cross-Complaint (of Wesco Insurance Company for: 1. Indemnity 2. Reimbursement); Filed by WESCO Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Diversified Automation Services, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • LIS PENDENS NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

. Suite 105 s, CA 91364

yulevard Woodland Hill phone (éil 654-9000 Facsimile (818) 654-9050

Tele

R - et o

| SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA -

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT, STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

DIVERSIFIED AUTOMATION CASE NO. BC681871

SERVICES, INC., a California corporation,

S’ e’

UNLIMITED CIVIL

Plaintiff, Assigned For All Purposes to Holly E. -Vs- Kendig, Dept. 42 |

GENERAL DENIAL OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPLAINT

REEVES MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation; WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation; STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., a Texas corporation; AMERICAN UNIVERSITY

PREPARATORY EDUCATION

FOUNDATION LLC, a California A corporation; SHEN ZHEN NEW WORLD I,

LLC F/K/A NEW WORLD/NEW AGE

HOLDING, LLC F/K/A NEW WORLD/NEW AGE I, LLC, a California privately owned company; SIMON REEVES, an individual; and DOES 1 to 100, inclusive,

Defendants.

N N N’o’

GENERAL DENIAL

The defendant, WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY (hereinafter referred to as “SURETY™), generally and specifically denies each and every allegation of the complaint, within the meaning of Code of Civil Procedure §431.30.