Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 01:30:13 (UTC).

DIVERSIFIED APARTMENTS LLC VS MARSHELL MILLER ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by DIVERSIFIED APARTMENTS LLC against MARSHELL MILLER in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0806

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIVERSIFIED APARTMENTS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

GRIFFITH TARA A.

MARCADO CECILIA G.

GRUJIC OLIVERA

ARTHURS KELLY D.

MOSES KEN

TAKEMOTO HIDEO

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/10/2018: SUMMONS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT ETC.

9/10/2018: VERIFIED COMPLAINT ETC.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/8/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Diversified Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Diversified Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Diversified Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less