This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 15:08:01 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. MAYIS TAHMAZYAN

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAYIS TAHMAZYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8907

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

TAHMAZYAN MAYIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES P.C.

JUN ERIC J

 

Court Documents

Complaint - CONTRACT

8/14/2018: Complaint - CONTRACT

Summons -

8/14/2018: Summons -

Notice of Case Management Conference -

8/14/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference -

Notice - OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

8/14/2018: Notice - OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

8/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

9/7/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice - Notice of Order to Show Cause

1/28/2019: Notice - Notice of Order to Show Cause

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - Declaration in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment [C.C.P. 585(d)]

2/5/2019: Declaration - Declaration in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment [C.C.P. 585(d)]

Declaration - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

2/5/2019: Declaration - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

Declaration - Declaration Plaintiff's Summary of the Case

2/5/2019: Declaration - Declaration Plaintiff's Summary of the Case

Declaration - Declaration for an Order Permitting the Use of Copies in Lieu of Originals in Obtaining Default and Default Judgment

2/5/2019: Declaration - Declaration for an Order Permitting the Use of Copies in Lieu of Originals in Obtaining Default and Default Judgment

Judgment - JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - BEFORE TRIAL - 03/20/2019 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AGAINST DEFENDANT TAHMAZYAN, MAYIS.

3/20/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - BEFORE TRIAL - 03/20/2019 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AGAINST DEFENDANT TAHMAZYAN, MAYIS.

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/5/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Entry of Default/Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 03/20/2019 entered for Plaintiff Discover Bank against Defendant Tahmazyan, Mayis.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)); Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( for an Order Permitting the Use of Copies in Lieu of Originals in Obtaining Default and Default Judgment); Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment [C.C.P. 585(d)]); Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Plaintiff's Summary of the Case); Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause); Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketNotice OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketSummons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUN ERIC J