Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 05:45:56 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS JOSE CHENG

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE CHENG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0031

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CHENG JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUN ERIC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

2/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUN ERIC