This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 00:59:14 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS NEXTGEN PRODUCTION LLP, A UNITED KINGDOM COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against NEXTGEN PRODUCTION LLP, A UNITED KINGDOM COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1230

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC.

Respondents

NEXTGEN PRODUCTION LLP A UNITED KINGDOM COMPANY

NEXTGEN PRODUCTION LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIM MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

4/22/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing on Petition

4/28/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Proof of Service by Mail

8/18/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AMENDED

8/10/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AMENDED

Proof of Service by Mail

8/10/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/5/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

9/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Ruling

9/17/2021: Notice of Ruling

Judgment - JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

9/16/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (Amended); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 21STCP01230 Hearing Date: September 16, 2021 Dept: 49

11. DIRECTORS GUILD V. NEXTGEN: 21STCP01230

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Directors Guild motion to\r\nconfirm arbitration award.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Granted on grounds set forth in the moving\r\npapers. The court intends to sign the\r\nproposed judgment.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant