This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 04:34:18 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS MANUSCRIPT MOVIE, LLC, A LOUISIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against MANUSCRIPT MOVIE, LLC, A LOUISIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4193

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Respondent

MANUSCRIPT MOVIE LLC A LOUISIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIM MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

5/4/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

5/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED

5/19/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER PETITION TO CONFIRM AND ARBITRATION...)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER PETITION TO CONFIRM AND ARBITRATION...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

5/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OR ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH

1/7/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OR ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

12/21/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Petition to Confirm and Arbitration Award) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Petition to Confirm and Arbitration...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketJudgment (- Arbitration Award - Before Trial - 05/19/2021 entered for Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation against Respondent Manuscript Movie, LLC, a Louisiana limited liability company.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (FOR CONFIRMATION OR ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM MICHELLE