This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 09:48:24 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS GO2 Z 3, LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against GO2 Z 3, LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. FRUIN, MALCOLM MACKEY and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1227

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD L. FRUIN

MALCOLM MACKEY

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC.

Respondents

GO2 Z 3 LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GO2 Z 4 LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE GLOBAL ASYLUM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GO2 Z 5 LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE GLOBAL ASYLUM INC.

GO2 Z 3 LLC

GO2 Z 5 LLC

GO2 Z 4 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KIM MICHELLE

FEINBERG MICHAEL R

GOLDFARB KIMBERLY J.

Respondent Attorney

MEEHAN SCOTT A.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

11/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R. FEINBERG IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

7/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R. FEINBERG IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES FIRST AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

7/13/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES FIRST AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION PETITIONERS FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THE

7/13/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION PETITIONERS FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/3/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/4/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/07/2021

6/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Reply - REPLY DGA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

6/15/2021: Reply - REPLY DGA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHELLE KIM IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

6/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHELLE KIM IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

Association of Attorney

6/15/2021: Association of Attorney

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/17/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/18/2021

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/18/2021

Substitution of Attorney

6/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing on Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith; and [Proposed] Order Thereon); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Set Petition For Hearing) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing on Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith; and [Proposed] Order); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael R. Feinberg in Support of Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (FIRST AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (PETITIONER?S FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award (and Entry of Judgment by Petitioner [954922432332]-) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Go2 Z 3, LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketResponse to Petition (to Confirm Arbitration Award; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Scott A. Meehan); Filed by Go2 Z 3, LLC (Respondent); Go2 Z 4, LLC (Respondent); Go2 Z 5, LLC (Respondent) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPetitioner's Amended Notice of Hearing on Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Michelle Kim in Support Thereof; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPetitioner's Notice of Hearing on Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Michelle Kim in Support Thereof; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing) (For Failure to Set Petition For Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award (And For Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Global Asylum, inc. is a litigant