This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 23:34:44 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS CINEMA ONE SPV2 LIMITED,A UNITED KINGDOM COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against CINEMA ONE SPV2 LIMITED,A UNITED KINGDOM COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3570

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC.

Respondents

CINEMA ONE SPV2 LIMITED

CINEMA ONE LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIM MICHELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Hearing on Motion - Other (Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMotion re: (Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause); Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM MICHELLE