This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 21:38:58 (UTC).

DIRECT CAPITAL CORPORATION VS. L. A. XPRESS ASSEMBLY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2017 DIRECT CAPITAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against L A XPRESS ASSEMBLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN, ROSS KLEIN, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL, LORI ANN FOURNIER, MICHAEL P. VICENCIA and MASTER CALENDAR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0974

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

ROSS KLEIN

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

MASTER CALENDAR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIRECT CAPITAL CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

CAL STATE EXPRESS

SHINDA RAM AHEER

L.A. X PRESS ASSEMBLY & DISTRIBUTION INC

L.A. XPRESS ASSEMBLY & DISTRIBUTION INC.

AHEER SHINDA RAM

L.A. XPRESS ASSEMBLY & DISTRIBUTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FERN ADAMS & ASSOCIATES (BARRY W. FERNS)

FERNS ADAMS AND ASSOCIATES

ADAMS LAUREL A

Defendant Attorneys

JBV LAW & ASSOCIATES

APOLLO ADAM MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/10/2017: Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/31/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

6/9/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

7/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/30/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/18/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/15/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

6/1/2018: Unknown

Unknown

6/11/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/12/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

6/20/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

7/23/2018: Unknown

Reply

9/21/2018: Reply

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Trial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Trial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding d...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference [related to VC065801])); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2017
  • Order to show cause; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by DIRECT CAPITAL CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Summons; Filed by DIRECT CAPITAL CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DIRECT CAPITAL CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.