This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 20:09:39 (UTC).

DINA ORELLANA SANDOVAL VS LASHIRLEY PRICE

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 DINA ORELLANA SANDOVAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LASHIRLEY PRICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6141

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL DINA ORELLANA

Defendant

PRICE LASHIRLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HONG KEVIN HYUNJONG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2024
  • Hearing12/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • Hearing06/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dina Orellana Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dina Orellana Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dina Orellana Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HONG KEVIN HYUNJONG