This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2023 at 12:35:18 (UTC).

DIMITRI TAMALIS VS REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 DIMITRI TAMALIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7122

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAMALIS DIMITRI

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC

INVESCO ADVISORS INC

KADOYA CRAIG

PAVILIONS STORE #2739

PAVILLIONS

REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING LLC

SAFEWAY

THE COCA-COLA COMPANY

WEST HOLLYWOOD RETAIL OWNER INC

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

PAVILLIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HAMED L

Defendant Attorneys

UNG ESQ. COURTNEY

RIVERA DANIELLE C.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/25/2023: Answer

Response - RESPONSE TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS INVESCO ADVISORS, INC. AND WEST HOLLYWOOD RETAIL OWNER, LLC

5/24/2023: Response - RESPONSE TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS INVESCO ADVISORS, INC. AND WEST HOLLYWOOD RETAIL OWNER, LLC

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/16/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service - No Service

5/16/2023: Proof of Service - No Service

Answer

4/27/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/27/2023: Cross-Complaint

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

4/14/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

8/22/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2024
  • Hearing08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • Hearing06/13/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, LLC (Defendant); THE COCA-COLA COMPANY (Defendant); As to: DIMITRI TAMALIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketResponse TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS INVESCO ADVISORS, INC. AND WEST HOLLYWOOD RETAIL OWNER, LLC; Filed by: DIMITRI TAMALIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint scheduled for 06/13/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: DIMITRI TAMALIS (Plaintiff); As to: CRAIG KADOYA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint; Filed by: WEST HOLLYWOOD RETAIL OWNER INC (Defendant); INVESCO ADVISORS, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketAddress for Gregory Edward Stone (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DIMITRI TAMALIS (Plaintiff); As to: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, LLC (Defendant); THE COCA-COLA COMPANY (Defendant); PAVILLIONS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DIMITRI TAMALIS (Plaintiff); As to: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, LLC (Defendant); THE COCA-COLA COMPANY (Defendant); PAVILLIONS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DIMITRI TAMALIS (Plaintiff); As to: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, LLC (Defendant); THE COCA-COLA COMPANY (Defendant); PAVILLIONS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less