This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 00:16:09 (UTC).

DIMAS ENAMORADO ET AL VS ABEL ZAPATA ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 DIMAS ENAMORADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ABEL ZAPATA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5601

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Defendants

ZAPATA ABEL

VALENTINEZ VALENTINO

SANCHEZ ELIZABETH RAFAEL

Guardian Ad Litem

ENAMORADO ALMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HERSKOVITZ MARK H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/5/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

1/4/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/2/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Unknown

4/5/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/5/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Answer

3/12/2018: Answer

Other -

3/12/2018: Other -

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/22/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/22/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/22/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Abel Zapata (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Dimas Enamorado (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Dimas Enamorado (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Abel Zapata (Defendant); Elizabeth Rafael Sanchez (Defendant); Valentino Valentinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Abel Zapata (Defendant); Elizabeth Rafael Sanchez (Defendant); Valentino Valentinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dimas Enamorado (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dimas Enamorado (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dimas Enamorado (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5601    Hearing Date: December 26, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Dimas Enamorado (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Alma Enamorado (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendants Abel Zapata, Elizabeth Rafel Sanchez, and Valentino Valentinez in exchange for $75,000.00. If approved, $12,183.96 will be used for medical expenses, $18,750.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $2,818.52 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $41,247.52 for Claimant to be invested into a single-premium deferred annuity with Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code ;; 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. ; 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the December 26, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERSKOVITZ MARK HOWARD