This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 17:15:26 (UTC).

DIGNITY HEALTH VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 DIGNITY HEALTH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0565

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGNITY HEALTH DBA CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEDDERBURN MICHELLE A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

6/23/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION CASE MANAGEMENT

7/7/2022: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION CASE MANAGEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (CASE MANAGEMENT); Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEDDERBURN MICHELLE A.