This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 18:20:45 (UTC).

DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1569

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION;

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIAO JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/27/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • Hearing12/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dignity Health (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIAO JENNIFER