This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2022 at 06:39:30 (UTC).

DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0946

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGNITY HEALTH A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYARS VENETIA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/20/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F51 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, a California non-profit public benefit corporation to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California non-profit public benefit corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, a California non-profit public benefit corporation to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., a California non-profit public benefit corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGNITY HEALTH, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/2022; Service Cost: 192.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGNITY HEALTH, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/2022; Service Cost: 91.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F51 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DIGNITY HEALTH, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DIGNITY HEALTH, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DIGNITY HEALTH, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYARS VENETIA