This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 07:44:12 (UTC).

DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), A CORPORATION, ET AL. VS XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC , A CORPORATION, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5339

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP INC. F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL INC. A CORPORATION

DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY LLC F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

CHUBB BERMUDA INSURANCE LTD. A CORPORATION

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY CO. A CORPORATION

ENDURANCE SPECIALTY INSURANCE LTD. A CORPORATION

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE CO. A CORPORATION

FREEDOM SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. A CORPORATION

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE CO. A CORPORATION

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY CO. A CORPORATION

TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE CO. A CORPORATION

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. A CORPORATION

XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O?HANLON MATTHEW B.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

12/9/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

12/8/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/16/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/16/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: FREEDOM SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., a corporation (Defendant); As to: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); As to: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE CO., a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/08/2022; Service Cost: 174.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/08/2022; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: CHUBB BERMUDA INSURANCE LTD., a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/15/2022; Service Cost: 172.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY CO., a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/08/2022; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE CO., a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/08/2022; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: ENDURANCE SPECIALTY INSURANCE LTD., a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/09/2022; Service Cost: 325.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); FREEDOM SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., a corporation (Defendant); CONTINENTAL CASUALTY CO., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); FREEDOM SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., a corporation (Defendant); CONTINENTAL CASUALTY CO., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DIGITALBRIDGE GROUP, INC. (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL, INC.), a corporation (Plaintiff); DIGITALBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A COLONY CAPITAL OPERATING COMPANY, LLC), a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); FREEDOM SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., a corporation (Defendant); CONTINENTAL CASUALTY CO., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENDURANCE SPECIALTY INSURANCE LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Chubb Bermuda Insurance Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant