Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2021 at 10:16:10 (UTC).

DIEGO JUAREZ VS ANITA THOMAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 DIEGO JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANITA THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0052

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAREZ DIEGO

Defendants

DOE MANAGER DOE 1

THOMAS IRIS

THOMAS ANITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHIRINYAN EDITA

MARTINIAN TIGRAN

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

11/12/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/19/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/19/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2023
  • Hearing10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Hearing04/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DIEGO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DIEGO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DIEGO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DIEGO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIRINYAN EDITA