This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 20:25:18 (UTC).

DIEGO CARRILLO VS CHUN SOK SUR

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 DIEGO CARRILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHUN SOK SUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9740

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO DIEGO

Defendant

SUR CHUN SOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCKEON ROBERT GREGORY

Other Attorneys

ORTIZ STEVEN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/25/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

6/11/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

6/11/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2024
  • Hearing03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Chun Sok Sur (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Chun Sok Sur (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Chun Sok Sur (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diego Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Diego Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Diego Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORTIZ STEVEN ANDREW