Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 10:50:26 (UTC).

DIEGO BONILLA LEON, ET AL. VS TRANSCRETE AMERICA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 DIEGO BONILLA LEON filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against TRANSCRETE AMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, PETER A. HERNANDEZ and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5931

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BONILLA LEON DIEGO

BONILLA ANA G.

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. FOR STARSTONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST

K.G. MULLEN INC.

Defendants

TRANSCRETE AMERICA

GROUT & CONCRETE PUMP SUPPLY INC.

TRANSCRETE AUSTRALIA PTY LTD

TRANSCRETE UK

GROUT & CONCRETE PUMP SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRANSCRETE AUSTRALIA PTY LTD AN AUSTRALIAN ENTITY

TRANSCRETE AMERICA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

TRANSCRETE U.K. AN ENGLISH ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KURTZ GARY ALAN

Attorney at Law Office of Gary Kurtz, APLC

30101 Agoura Ct Ste 130

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

DANIEL KELSEY ESQ.

KURTZ GARY

Defendant Attorneys

NOLAN PAUL J

DE VERA VEEPEE

ESHAGHI ELYZA P

MAVROMATIS STEPHANIE MARIA

ORLETSKY KATHERINE E.

FLYNN TARA-JANE L.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

3/26/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE: STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION

11/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE: STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

6/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE DETERMINATION;) OF 02/04/2020

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE DETERMINATION;) OF 02/04/2020

Case Management Statement

12/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/16/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

5/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Order - ORDER BY THE COURT TO TRANSFER MATTER AS A COMPLICATED PI CASE TO AN IC COURT

3/29/2019: Order - ORDER BY THE COURT TO TRANSFER MATTER AS A COMPLICATED PI CASE TO AN IC COURT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/8/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO STRIKE

3/18/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO STRIKE

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO STRIKE

3/22/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice - Notice Notice of Defendant Grout & Concrete Pump Supply Inc, Joinder to Transcrete America's Motion to Strike Portions of first amended complaint

2/28/2019: Notice - Notice Notice of Defendant Grout & Concrete Pump Supply Inc, Joinder to Transcrete America's Motion to Strike Portions of first amended complaint

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

1/29/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Answer

1/9/2019: Answer

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Transcrete America, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Diego Bonilla Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Grout & Concrete Pump Supply Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Transcrete America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Veepee De Vera); Filed by Transcrete America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketJoinder to Motion (Notice Motion Joinder to Motion to Strike Claim for Punitive Damages); Filed by Transcrete America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by Transcrete America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Diego Bonilla Leon (Plaintiff); Ana G. Bonilla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Diego Bonilla Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diego Bonilla Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KG MULLEN INC. is a litigant