This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 08:17:47 (UTC).

DIDIER ANDRADE VS ROUSICK MINASSIANS

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 DIDIER ANDRADE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROUSICK MINASSIANS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2141

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDRADE DIDIER

Defendant

MINASSIANS ROUSICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FACCHETTI ADRIANOS

TEDFORD JAMES ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

GRANDY ALLISON L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/8/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/8/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/8/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/2/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/25/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2024
  • Hearing07/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2023
  • Hearing12/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Adrianos Facchetti (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketAddress for Adrianos Facchetti (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rousick Minassians (Defendant); As to: Didier Andrade (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rousick Minassians (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Didier Andrade (Plaintiff); As to: Rousick Minassians (Defendant); Service Date: 08/06/2022; Service Cost: 201.39; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Didier Andrade (Plaintiff); As to: Rousick Minassians (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Didier Andrade (Plaintiff); As to: Rousick Minassians (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Didier Andrade (Plaintiff); As to: Rousick Minassians (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less